This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 15:36:43 (UTC).

EDWIN MARTINEZ VS CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 EDWIN MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9082

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ EDWIN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT A LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY

ICON WEST INC.

1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE ROE

D & M PAINTING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L.

Defendant Attorneys

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER

MALLORY GEORGE LORENZO

CHAN KA IN

Cross Defendant Attorney

LEVITT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DUPLICATE REQUEST

10/11/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DUPLICATE REQUEST

Request for Dismissal

10/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/13/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

9/13/2022: Separate Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/31/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

8/8/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/8/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/29/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/29/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2025
  • Hearing03/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 11/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Duplicate Request; Filed by: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by EDWIN MARTINEZ on 03/15/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by EDWIN MARTINEZ as to COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); As to: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, a public entity (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a law enforcement agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, a public entity (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a law enforcement agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDWIN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, a public entity (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a law enforcement agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D & M PAINTING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ICON WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA CLARITA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.