This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:43:43 (UTC).

EDWIN MARTINEZ, ET AL VS. IN HIS PRESENCE,LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 EDWIN MARTINEZ, filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against IN HIS PRESENCE,LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9886

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ EDWIN

VELASQUEZ JOCELIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

IN HIS PRESENCE L.L.C. A CALIFORNIA

KHOSRAVIZADEH MARIYAN GENERAL PARTNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

P&R LEGAL SERVICE

Defendant Attorney

ZIEVE BRODNAX & STEELE LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF AND ETC.

2/20/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF AND ETC.

Minute Order

3/7/2018: Minute Order

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT MARIYAN KOSRAVIZADEH

3/7/2018: ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT MARIYAN KOSRAVIZADEH

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/26/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/26/2018: DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC'S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/6/2018: DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC'S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC

7/9/2018: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/1/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by IN HIS PRESENCE, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by IN HIS PRESENCE, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD RECLASSIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

FILE

Superior Court of California

ZIEVE, BRODNAX & STEELE, LLP untv of Los Anqelog

John C. Steele, Bar No. 179875

Jennifer A. Needs, Bar No. 261153 St DEC 19 2017

30 Corporate Park, Suite 450 el R. Canerricxocyii , Irvine, CA 92606 By ve Officer/Clerk

Telephone: (714) 848-7920 S on —— Deputy Fax: (714) 908-2615

Attorneys for Defendant and Cross-Complainant IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC

and Defendant MARTY AN KHOSRAVIZADEH

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

EDWIN MARTINEZ and Case No. BC679886 JOCELIN A. VELASQUEZ, Date Action Filed: June 5, 2017

Plaintiffs, Limited Civil Case Reclassified o As An Unlimited Civil Case

IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC, a California DEFENDANTS IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC limited liability company; MARIYAN AND MARIYAN KOSRAVIZADEH’S KOSRAVIZADEH, general partner; and NOTICE OF AND DEMURRER TO DOES 1 through 50, COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST Defendants. FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION

OF JENNIFER A. NEEDS

Hearing:

Date: January 31, 2018 Time: 8:30 am.

Dept: 16

Reservation #: 171219275371

Tnal Date: None Set

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN HIS PRESENCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant