This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 21:06:28 (UTC).

EDWIN I GUARDIA VS CITIMORTGAGE INC., (LENDER) A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 EDWIN I GUARDIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CITIMORTGAGE INC , LENDER A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0700

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARDIA EDWIN I

Defendants

SN SERVICING CORPORATION AN ALASKA CORPORATION ATTORNEY IH FACT FOR U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TYHE CABANA SERIES IV TRUST

ALLISON HOLLAND VICE PRESIDENT FOR SN SERVICING CORPORATION

PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES TRUSTEE

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF THE CABANA SERIES IV TRUST

BRIANA YOUNG TRUSTEE SALE OFFICER FOR PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES

CITIMORTGAGE INC. LENDER A NEW YORK CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE ESTABLISHING PLAINTIFF'S JURY TRIAL DEMAND

1/19/2021: Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE ESTABLISHING PLAINTIFF'S JURY TRIAL DEMAND

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE TO FURTHER ESTABLISH PLAINTIFF'S JURY TRIAL DEMAND

1/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE TO FURTHER ESTABLISH PLAINTIFF'S JURY TRIAL DEMAND

Notice of Deposit - Jury - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/19/2021: Notice of Deposit - Jury - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/21/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

1/8/2021: Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

Case Management Statement

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Citimortgage Inc., (lender) a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketBrief (in Support of Notice Establishing Plaintiff's Jury Trial Demand); Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (to Further Establish Plaintiff's Jury Trial Demand); Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMotion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edwin I Guardia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where SN SERVICING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant