This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 11:16:22 (UTC).

EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS EDUARDO CAMPOS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDUARDO CAMPOS, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8030

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLANCO AN INDIVIDUAL EDWIN HERNANDEZ

Defendants

CAMPOS AN INDIVIDUAL EDUARDO

CAMPOS AN INDIVIDUAL ROGELIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARUSO MARY L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual on 08/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant); ROGELIO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant); ROGELIO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant); ROGELIO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDWIN HERNANDEZ BLANCO, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant); ROGELIO CAMPOS, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less