Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 02:55:18 (UTC).

EDWIN FRANZEN VS LOS ANGELES REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD, A PUBLIC AGENCY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 EDWIN FRANZEN filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against LOS ANGELES REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD, A PUBLIC AGENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1151

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANZEN EDWIN

Defendants

LOS ANGELES REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD A PUBLIC AGENCY

STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD A PUBLIC AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LANGA BRIAN DONALD

Defendant Attorney

ZARRO MICHAEL THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/15/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/15/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE JUNE 25, 2020 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; PROPOSED ORDER

6/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE JUNE 25, 2020 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

3/23/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Petition for Writ of Mandate

3/18/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request - REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

3/19/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue the June 25, 2020 Trial Setting Conference; Proposed Order); Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest (for Administrative Record); Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edwin Franzen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Water Resource Control is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZARRO MICHAEL T.