Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 05:36:02 (UTC).

EDWIN ALDANA, ET AL. VS MELTAN DAVOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 EDWIN ALDANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MELTAN DAVOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2179

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALDANA EDWIN

AVALOS CARLOS

Defendants

HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

DAVOOD MELTAN

STEPANIAN RAFFI

SARGSYAN EDUARD

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC;

HERTZ RENTAL

SHAHGELDYAN KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2024
  • Hearing03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDWIN ALDANA (Plaintiff); CARLOS AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDWIN ALDANA (Plaintiff); CARLOS AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDWIN ALDANA (Plaintiff); CARLOS AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ RENTAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant