Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2020 at 02:32:36 (UTC).

EDWIN AGHAMALI VS FCA US LLC; A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 EDWIN AGHAMALI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6374

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGHAMALI EDWIN

Defendants

VAN NUYS FIAT; BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

FCA US LLC; A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESHISHIAN ARNO HILL

Defendant Attorney

GREGG MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

12/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

12/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

11/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Case Management Statement

9/4/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2020

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2020

Notice of Settlement

9/21/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

5/28/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by FCA US LLC; a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edwin Aghamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by FCA US LLC; a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Edwin Aghamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FCA US LLC; a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC; a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edwin Aghamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edwin Aghamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edwin Aghamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less