This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 03:01:44 (UTC).

EDWARD, OLLIE M. VS EDWARD, JOHN

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 EDWARD, OLLIE M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDWARD, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDWARD OLLIE M.

Respondent

EDWARD JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHYER LISA NOEL

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/15/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - FL Cover

8/11/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - FL Cover

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition

8/11/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition

Summons - Summons

8/11/2022: Summons - Summons

Proof of Service of Summons - FL-115 POS

8/23/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - FL-115 POS

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt - FL-117 NAR

8/23/2022: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt - FL-117 NAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt (FL-117 NAR )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (FL-115 POS )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (FL Cover )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHYER LISA NOEL