This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 14:17:55 (UTC).

EDWARD BUSTAMANTE, ET AL. VS MICHAEL JOHN LABELLARTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 EDWARD BUSTAMANTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL JOHN LABELLARTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1109

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ JULIA

BUSTAMANTE EDWARD

Defendants

U-HAUL COMPANY OF ARIZONA

LABELLARTE MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES BRADLEY G

Defendant Attorney

FREED LEESA ANN

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/8/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2024
  • Hearing03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Hearing09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael John Labellarte (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael John Labellarte (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edward Bustamante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edward Bustamante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edward Bustamante (Plaintiff); Julia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edward Bustamante (Plaintiff); Julia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edward Bustamante (Plaintiff); Julia Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES BRADLEY G