This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 14:16:17 (UTC).

EDWARD ANDREWS VS BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 EDWARD ANDREWS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5626

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANDREWS EDWARD

Defendants and Respondents

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP INC

6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

BRAIDI FREDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JONATHAN LACOUR

LACOUR JONATHAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BALLARD ROSENBERG GOLPER & SAVITT LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6 AND TO CONTINUE OR VACATE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; ETC

4/13/2018: DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6 AND TO CONTINUE OR VACATE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; ETC

NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST-MSC STATUS CONFERENCE, DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6 AND TO CONTIN

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST-MSC STATUS CONFERENCE, DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6 AND TO CONTIN

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT REACHED AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 664.6

5/21/2018: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT REACHED AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 664.6

DEFENDANTS EVII)ENTIARV OB.JECTJONSTO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDFINCE SUBI1ITTEL) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENI)ANTS' MOTION TO INF?ORCF SE?R[LEMI.:N?[ A (; RE FM F NT

6/6/2018: DEFENDANTS EVII)ENTIARV OB.JECTJONSTO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDFINCE SUBI1ITTEL) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENI)ANTS' MOTION TO INF?ORCF SE?R[LEMI.:N?[ A (; RE FM F NT

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

6/13/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

6/13/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

DICLARATION OF LRIC C. SCIIWE1TNIANN RF: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFFRKNCE

8/21/2018: DICLARATION OF LRIC C. SCIIWE1TNIANN RF: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFFRKNCE

Minute Order

8/22/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/5/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

12/4/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

11/17/2017: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/21/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS

6/19/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/24/2017: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Edward Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DICLARATION OF LRIC C. SCIIWE1TNIANN RF: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFFRKNCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Boulevard Nightlife Group Inc (Defendant); Freddy Braidi (Defendant); 6356 Second Floor, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Edward Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FORT 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES (LABOR CODE 204, 206, 218.5 AND ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Edward Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less