This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 01:27:39 (UTC).

EDWARD A. HEFFNER, ET AL. VS CARRIER CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 EDWARD A HEFFNER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CARRIER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8572

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEFFNER EDWARD A.

HEFFNER BARBARA

Defendants

CARRIER CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORP. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

EATON HYDRAULICS FKA VICKERS PUMPS

ELLIOTT COMPANY

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

FMC CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS IPG LLC

HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

KAISER-GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY

SOCO WEST INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION AKA STINNES OIL AND CHEMICAL COMPANY

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLS DIMITRI

Defendant Attorneys

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

AMEELE MELANIE LEIGH

DAVIS GEOFFREY M.

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

DUFFY JOSEPH

MARTIN NICOLAS

MUENCH RICHARD A.

POND FRANCIS DENNIS

SCADDEN JAMES

SHAFFER D SCOTT

GIRALDO ALEXANDER BEAU

JENKINS CHARLES

KUM ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

1/12/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/18/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTIFICATION OF DEATH

10/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTIFICATION OF DEATH

Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

9/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

Demand for Jury Trial

9/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (GORI LAW FIRM))

9/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (GORI LAW FIRM))

Answer

9/17/2021: Answer

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Answer

9/21/2021: Answer

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING EXXON MOBIL OIL

9/30/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING EXXON MOBIL OIL

Answer - ANSWER TO DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL

9/30/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY -ASBESTOS

9/30/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY -ASBESTOS

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

10/1/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edward A. Heffner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notification of Death); Filed by Barbara Heffner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Regarding Exxon Mobil Corporation); Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Defendant Exxon Mobil); Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOrder (On Stipulation Regarding Exxon Mobil Oil); Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff's Complaint For Personal Injury -Asbestos); Filed by The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Plantiffs' Complaint for personal injury- Asbestos ( Negligence; false representation; Premises liability; Contractor liability; strict liability- general maritime law; negligence general maritime law; loss of consortium) Request Jury Trial.); Filed by Kaiser-Gypsum Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edward A. Heffner (Plaintiff); Barbara Heffner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edward A. Heffner (Plaintiff); Barbara Heffner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCO WEST INC. is a litigant