This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2022 at 03:32:10 (UTC).

EDVIN ANTONIO PERAZA VS JACOB BRIAN HAMMETT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 EDVIN ANTONIO PERAZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JACOB BRIAN HAMMETT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8815

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERAZA EDVIN ANTONIO

Defendants

HAMMETT JACOB BRIAN

HAMMETT ANN MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER H. WAYNE

MAZZA STEVEN L.

Defendant Attorney

READER CHAN BLAKE

Other Attorneys

MANUKYAN AREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Association of Attorney

6/3/2022: Association of Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/20/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Jacob Brian Hammett (Defendant); Ann Marie Hammett (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Chan Blake Reader (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jacob Brian Hammett (Defendant); Ann Marie Hammett (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jacob Brian Hammett (Defendant); Ann Marie Hammett (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edvin Antonio Peraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANUKYAN AREN