This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:33:25 (UTC).

EDUARDO VAZQUEZ VS GLOBAL PARATRANSIT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 EDUARDO VAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GLOBAL PARATRANSIT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4265

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAZQUEZ EDUARDO

Defendant

GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC. DBA GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOURMAND MICHAEL

BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

DE SARIO JAMES A.

Defendant Attorney

SOLIS JOHN EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/29/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARB...)

4/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARB...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING

4/22/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/25/2022

3/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/25/2022

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/25/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (GLOBAL PARATRANSIT, INC.)

1/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (GLOBAL PARATRANSIT, INC.)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

1/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Notice of Appearance

1/20/2022: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

2/3/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/9/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

2/9/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

2/9/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Global Paratransit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling of Motion to Compel Arbitration or Responsive Pleading) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motion to Compel Arb...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Claims and Defendant's Responsive Pleading); Filed by Global Paratransit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Global Paratransit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9; Status Conference (ReFirst Amended Complaint And/Or CRC 3.770 Dismissal of Class Allegations) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling of First Amended Complaint And/Or CRC 3.770 Dismissal of Class Allegations (or an FAC alleging a single PAGA cause of action only)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Eduardo Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons (Global Paratransit, Inc.)); Filed by Eduardo Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduardo Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduardo Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.