This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 00:00:52 (UTC).

EDUARDO RAMIREZ VS GLOVA LINK CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 EDUARDO RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLOVA LINK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6775

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ EDUARDO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

SERGIO VILLAMEDRANO

GLOVA LINK CORPORATION

VILLAMEDRANO SERGIO

GLOVA-LINK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BRANDON SUA & ASSOCIATES

O'CONNOR MICHAEL P.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEGRAVE DOUGLAS M.

DEGRAVE DOUGLAS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT CONCLUSIONS OF LIABILITY AND WITNESS STATEMENTS

1/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT CONCLUSIONS OF LIABILITY AND WITNESS STATEMENTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE CASE-SPECIFIC HEARSAY STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO PEOPLE V. SANCHEZ

1/14/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE CASE-SPECIFIC HEARSAY STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO PEOPLE V. SANCHEZ

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

1/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MIL #2

1/17/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MIL #2

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS RECEIVED BY PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS RECEIVED BY PLAINTIFF

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION OF DEFENSE EXPERT EDWARD FATZINGER, JR., MS PE

1/31/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION OF DEFENSE EXPERT EDWARD FATZINGER, JR., MS PE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/3/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (2ND); FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (2ND); FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION [THREE]

2/10/2020: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION [THREE]

Special Verdict

2/13/2020: Special Verdict

Request for Dismissal

2/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/4/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL)

8/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/21/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Eduardo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Glova-Link Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department I; Order to Show Cause - Settlement - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eduardo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department I; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSpecial Verdict; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketJury Question ([Five]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department I; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Glova-Link Corporation (Defendant); Sergio Villamedrano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Glova-Link Corporation (Defendant); Sergio Villamedrano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Glova-Link Corporation (Defendant); Sergio Villamedrano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC676775    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: I

TENTATIVE RULINGS ON PLAINTIFF’S IN LIMINE MOTIONS

Plaintiff’s No. 2 – Motion To exclude Evidence of Gambling or Tax Returns

Allow use of tax returns redacted to exclude all evidence of income other than plaintiff’s earnings from driving. Other income sources are not relevant. Mention of gambling is irrelevant and prejudicial.

Plaintiff’s No. 4 – Motion to exclude Expert Opinion of Fatzinger

Hearing required. No Opposition was filed.

RULINGS ON DEFENDANTS’ IN LIMINE MOTIONS

No. 3 – Exclude Traffic Collision Report Conclusions of Liability and Witness Statements

Grant as to any conclusions of liability stated in report. Witness statement may be used to impeach testimony of witnesses at trial or to cross-examine experts.

No. 7 – Exclude Case-Specific Hearsay Statements

Grant, except where statements are relevant to impeach experts, or otherwise admissible under exception to hearsay rule.

No. 8 – Exclude Evidence of Settlement with 3rd Party Khadarian

Grant, unless Khadarian testifies.