Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2021 at 04:16:42 (UTC).

EDUARDO MORALES PRECIADO VS CYNTHIA MARIE BUSTILLOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 EDUARDO MORALES PRECIADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CYNTHIA MARIE BUSTILLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4500

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRECIADO EDUARDO MORALES

Defendants

BUSTILLOS CYNTHIA MARIE

BUSTILLOS EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUTTING STACEY RAE

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/26/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/26/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/26/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

9/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

9/24/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/25/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/25/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service - No Service

9/17/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE PROOF OF NOT FOUND

9/17/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE PROOF OF NOT FOUND

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/10/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Hearing03/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cynthia Marie Bustillos (Defendant); Edward Bustillos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cynthia Marie Bustillos (Defendant); Edward Bustillos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cynthia Marie Bustillos (Defendant); Edward Bustillos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service (Proof of Not Found); Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduardo Morales Preciado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUTTING STACEY RAE