This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 01:19:38 (UTC).

EDUARDO JR SANDOVAL VS ETHAN SAMUEL MINKOW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 EDUARDO JR SANDOVAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ETHAN SAMUEL MINKOW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6887

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL EDUARDO JR

Defendants

MINKOW ETHAN SAMUEL

MINKOW NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX ESQ.

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX

Defendant Attorneys

ROTH HEATHER

ROTH HEATHER MICHELE ESQ.

GRANT MINDI CLAUDIA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

5/13/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES - COM...)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES - COM...)

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

4/22/2022: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

4/20/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

Notice - NOTICE DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

4/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE DISCOVERY RESPONSES STILL AT ISSUE AND ADDITIONAL BACKGROUND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

3/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION, SET ONE

4/15/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

4/15/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

4/15/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 25, 2022 HEARING ON...) OF 04/15/2022

4/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 25, 2022 HEARING ON...) OF 04/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 25, 2022 HEARING ON...)

4/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 25, 2022 HEARING ON...)

Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT RE: IDC FURTHER RESPONSES

4/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT RE: IDC FURTHER RESPONSES

Notice - NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPLETING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTARY AT DEPOSITION HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

3/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPLETING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTARY AT DEPOSITION HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3/3/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

2/7/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE, TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANC

12/30/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE, TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANC

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Ethan Samuel Minkow (Defendant); Nicole Minkow (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Specially Prepared Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Com...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Specially Prepared Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ethan Samuel Minkow (Defendant); Nicole Minkow (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ethan Samuel Minkow (Defendant); Nicole Minkow (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eduardo Jr Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eduardo Jr Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduardo Jr Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduardo Jr Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Jr Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6887 Hearing Date: April 25, 2022 Dept: 30

EDUARDO JR SANDOVAL vs ETHAN SAMUEL MINKOW, et al.Court Order Re: Continuance of the April 25, 2022 Hearing on Two Motions to Compel Plaintiff's Further Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories to April 26, 2022On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 04/25/2022, and Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiff's Verified Responses and Further Verified Responses to Defendants' Specially Prepared Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 04/25/2022 are continued to 04/26/2022 at 01:30