This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 04:14:37 (UTC).

EDUARDO GONZALEZ VS MELANNIE CASTELLON-ESCOBAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 EDUARDO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MELANNIE CASTELLON-ESCOBAR,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6569

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GONZALEZ EDUARDO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CASTELLON-ESCOBAR MELANNIE

PERRY BRYAN

GONZALEZ EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAER TRACY MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

YUN CHARLES C

OLSON SONALI

KIM CHRISTIAN HEESOO

Cross Defendant Attorney

RINCON MICHAEL ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/16/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/16/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

8/22/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

11/2/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

12/5/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/14/2022: Answer

Answer

1/10/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/10/2023: Cross-Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Charles C Yun (Attorney): Middle Name changed from C. to C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Bryan Perry (Defendant); As to: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bryan Perry (Defendant); As to: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Eduardo Gonzalez (Cross-Defendant); As to: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); As to: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Bryan Perry (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons CROSS-COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); As to: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Bryan Perry (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); As to: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); Bryan Perry (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); Bryan Perry (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eduardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Melannie Castellon-Escobar (Defendant); Bryan Perry (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAER TRACY MITCHELL