This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 04:34:07 (UTC).

EDUARDO GARCIA VS STACY LARES

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 EDUARDO GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STACY LARES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7822

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA EDUARDO

Defendant

LARES STACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCREYNOLDS C. R.

Defendant Attorney

CHUN DARRELL J.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

5/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2024
  • Hearing05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stacy Lares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN DARRELL J.