Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 15:56:05 (UTC).

EDUARDO CENTENO VS TLC MOVING SERVICES, INC. (A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 EDUARDO CENTENO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TLC MOVING SERVICES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8138

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTENO EDUARDO

Defendants

TLC MOVING SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAYEK ANTOINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

MERLUZA RICARDO Y.

Defendant Attorneys

DERBARSEGHIAN ARN

DERBARSEGHIAN AREN

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/19/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

8/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

7/6/2020: Answer

Answer

7/6/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/13/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TLC Moving Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); Antoine Hayek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eduardo Centeno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TLC Moving Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Antoine Hayek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduardo Centeno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduardo Centeno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduardo Centeno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA