This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 17:55:53 (UTC).

EDUARDO CARDENAS, III VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR, CO., INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 EDUARDO CARDENAS, III filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR, CO , INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2896

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDENAS EDUARDO III

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORROW III NEAL F.

Defendant Attorney

TRAN TRANG T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

7/14/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/19/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • Hearing11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR, CO., INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDUARDO CARDENAS, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDUARDO CARDENAS, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDUARDO CARDENAS, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDUARDO CARDENAS, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORROW NEAL F.