This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 09:05:59 (UTC).

EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0552

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ EDUARDO AGUILAR

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIZRAHI GUY

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/25/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/24/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

9/26/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PROOF OF SERVICE

10/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D updated: Result Date to 11/21/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Eduardo Aguilar Ramirez (Plaintiff): First Name changed from EDUARDO to Eduardo; Last Name changed from RAMIREZ to Ramirez; Middle Name changed from AGUILAR to Aguilar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- General Motors LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from GENERAL MOTORS LLC to General Motors LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Guy Mizrahi (Attorney): First Name changed from GUY to Guy; Last Name changed from MIZRAHI to Mizrahi; Organization Name changed from JOURNEY LAW GROUP, INC. to Journey Law Group, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAddress for Guy Mizrahi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cameron M. Major (Attorney): Organization Name changed from ERSKINE LAW GROUP, PC to Erskine Law Group; Middle Name: M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAddress for Cameron M. Major (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDUARDO AGUILAR RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIZRAHI GUY