This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:20:27 (UTC).

EDUARD PENA VS NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 EDUARD PENA filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3538

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENA EDUARD

Defendants

NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

DEUTSCH M.D. ANDREW L.

GABRIEL M.D. ANTHONY

RENAISSANCE IMAGING MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY BRUCE THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

HEIDTKE DANIEL BARTHOLOMEW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/24/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/24/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/24/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/16/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/16/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/16/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE T MURRAY

3/25/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE T MURRAY

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.770

4/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.770

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

12/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Initial Status Conference Order

12/20/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/20/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/20/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

12/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Re: Dismissal of Class Action in Accordance with California Rules of Court Rule 3.770); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Declaration of Bruce T Murray; Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by Renaissance Imaging Medical Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Andrew L. Deutsch, M.D. (Defendant); Anthony Gabriel, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by Renaissance Imaging Medical Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Andrew L. Deutsch, M.D. (Defendant); Anthony Gabriel, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by Renaissance Imaging Medical Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Andrew L. Deutsch, M.D. (Defendant); Anthony Gabriel, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 12/20/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons Norwalk Community Hospital); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduard Pena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORWALK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where RENAISSANCE IMAGING MEDICAL ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY BRUCE T.