This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 19:19:42 (UTC).

EDUARD GHAZARYAN VS HYON KYOUNG NAMKUNG

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 EDUARD GHAZARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HYON KYOUNG NAMKUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1525

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GHAZARYAN EDUARD

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

NAMKUNG HYON KYOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BELORYAN HAIK ESQ.

SHAKHGELDYAN VAHE ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/28/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY THE DEFENDANT TO C...)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY THE DEFENDANT TO C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 03/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED I...)

1/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED I...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN OR...)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN OR...)

Exhibit List

11/22/2019: Exhibit List

Statement of the Case

11/22/2019: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #5XPTTESTIMONY

11/22/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #5XPTTESTIMONY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #7REOPENSTMT

11/22/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #7REOPENSTMT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #6GOLDENRULE

11/22/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #6GOLDENRULE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NEGLIGENCE

11/22/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NEGLIGENCE

Statement of the Case

11/26/2019: Statement of the Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/31/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

11/1/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • Hearing07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Eduard Ghazaryan (Plaintiff); Hyon Kyoung Namkung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hyon Kyoung Namkung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eduard Ghazaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eduard Ghazaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701525    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 2

Ghazaryan v. Namkung

Plaintiff’s Two (2) Motions to Compel Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents from Defendant, Hyon Kyoung; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED.  Plaintiff’s Motion to Deem the Matters in his Requests for Admission to Defendant, Hyon Kyoung Namkung, Admitted; Request for Sanctions is GRANTED.

Plaintiff served discovery on Defendant on 2/12/19. Declaration of Haik Beloryan, ¶ 4, Ex. A. Defendant untimely served unverified responses on 9/25/19. Id. at ¶ 5. Plaintiff never received verifications from Defendant. Id. at ¶ 6.

Unverified responses are “tantamount to no responses at all.” Appleton v. Superior Court (1988) 206 Cal.App.3d 632, 635-36.

Defendant, Hyon Kyoung, is ordered to provide verified responses without objections to the foregoing discovery within 20 days.

Further, the Requests for Admission served on Defendant are deemed admitted.  Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2033.280(b).

Imposition of sanctions against Defendant and counsel, Kingle, Rodiger & Spriggs, PC, is warranted for the failure to timely respond to authorized methods of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure §2023.010(d); 2033.280.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Accordingly, the court imposes total sanctions of $780.00 for all three motions against Defendant and counsel, Kingle, Rodiger & Spriggs, PC.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC701525    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 2

BC701525 Ghazaryan v. Namkung

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motions to Compel Discovery Responses set for 12/3/19 is continued to 1/7/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due date for the opposition and reply is based on the original hearing date.