This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:41:09 (UTC).

EDMON WASHINGTON VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by EDMON WASHINGTON against CITY OF LOS ANGELES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8026

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WASHINGTON EDMON

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

OFFICER ERIC OLIVE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

OLIVE OFFICER ERIC

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

4/23/2018: DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

4/23/2018: DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MAILING

4/23/2018: DECLARATION OF MAILING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND OFFICER ERIC OLIVE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/9/2018: DEFENDANTS CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND OFFICER ERIC OLIVE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/12/2018: ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY WITHOUT PREJUDICE

STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/12/2018: STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/24/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/30/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

SUMMONS

3/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY (CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE 815.2(A), 820(A); CAL. CIVIL CODE 43); ETC

3/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY (CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE 815.2(A), 820(A); CAL. CIVIL CODE 43); ETC

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Officer Eric Olive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BATTERY WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Stipulation; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Order; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DEFENDANTS CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND OFFICER ERIC OLIVE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Officer Eric Olive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Edmon Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY (CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE 815.2(A), 820(A); CAL. CIVIL CODE 43); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698026    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

edmon washington,

Plaintiff,

v.

city of los angeles, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC698026

Hearing Date: December 17, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

DefendantS’ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE

Judge Goorvitch was sworn-in as a Superior Court Judge on December 15, 2015.  Prior to that time, Judge Goorvitch made the following campaign contributions to Michael N. Feuer: (1) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2008 campaign for the 42nd Assembly District on or about November 9, 2007; (2) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2010 campaign for the 42nd Assembly District on or about October 19, 2010; and (3) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2013 campaign for Los Angeles City Attorney on or about May 30, 2012.  Judge Goorvitch has no personal relationship with Mr. Feuer and has had no communications with Mr. Feuer since he became the City Attorney.  The Court can be fair and impartial in this matter. 

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff Edmon Washington (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants City of Los Angeles and Officer Eric Olive (“Defendants”) based on injuries he sustained from an encounter with police officers. Defendant moves to continue the trial date, currently set for March 5, 2020, to March 12, 2020. The proof of service does not reflect the address at which the motion was served, and Plaintiff has not filed anything in response to the motion, so the Court cannot determine whether service was proper. Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 17, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court