This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 10:19:14 (UTC).

EDITH RAMIREZ, ET AL. VS JAIME ORTEGA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 EDITH RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAIME ORTEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0293

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ MARGARITA

RAMIREZ EDITH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

ORTEGA JAIME

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

RAMIREZ EDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK ROBERT S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TUSA DAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE SUMMONS

7/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

10/28/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Cross-Complaint

10/28/2021: Cross-Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2024
  • Hearing05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by JAIME ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JAIME ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAIME ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by JAIME ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by EDITH RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDITH RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE SUMMONS); Filed by JAIME ORTEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDITH RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARGARITA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDITH RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARGARITA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDITH RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARGARITA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUSA DAN