This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 23:22:27 (UTC).

EDGIL REID VS ARRI,INC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 EDGIL REID filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ARRI,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5611

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REID EDGIL

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ARRI INC

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

ALIKIN ESQ ALBERT K

MOROVATI CHRISTINA Y

ALIKIN ALBERT K

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/17/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/25/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lien

10/9/2020: Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien

10/9/2020: Notice of Lien

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

2/11/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ARRI, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Erroneously Sued As ARRI,INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ARRI, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Erroneously Sued As ARRI,INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARRI, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Erroneously Sued As ARRI,INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ARRI, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Erroneously Sued As ARRI,INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by ARRI, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Erroneously Sued As ARRI,INC (Defendant); SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDGIL REID (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRI INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALIKIN ALBERT K