This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 12:59:12 (UTC).

EDGARDO PANO, JR. VS SERRANO DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 EDGARDO PANO, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SERRANO DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GLORIA WHITE-BROWN, THOMAS C. FALLS and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5419

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

THOMAS C. FALLS

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PANO EDGARDO JR.

JONELLE SOLLER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EDGARDO ANTONIO PANO AND IN HER PERSONAL CAPACITY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF AZUSA A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOLLER JONELLE

AZUSA BLOCK 36 LLC.

SERRANO DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

PACIFIC EMPIRE BUILDERS INC.

B.L. PRICE CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CITY OF AZUSA

MANUAL D. TEJEDA TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORALES LUIS

RIGHT TRUCK INC.

RIGHT TRUCK. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RIOS C&S TRANSPORT INC.

RIOS MORALES LUIS EDWARDO

RIOS TRUCKING

TED SAKAIDA & SONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

B.L. PRICE CO. INC.

B.L. PRICE CO. INC. DOE 1

MOE 1 RIGHT TRUCK I NC.

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

AZUSA BLOCK 36 LLC.

SERRANO DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC.

PACIFIC EMPIRE BUILDERS INC.

B.L. PRICE CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MANUAL D. TEJEDA TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORALES LUIS

RIGHT TRUCK INC.

RIGHT TRUCK. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RIOS MORALES LUIS EDWARDO

TED SAKAIDA & SONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMINDER S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

OBRA-WHITE BETHSAIDA

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY S.

BERGSTEN ROBERT

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKER LAWRENCE SI II ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

RUTTER MARK DENIS ESQ.

SAKAI KIMBERLEY HENDRIKA ESQ.

SAFAR BRITTANY LAUREN

GOLDSTEIN ROY DAVID ESQ.

Other Attorneys

DREYER ROGER

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION (OF BETHSAIDA C. OBRA-WHITE FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SUN AGGREGATE LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41)

11/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION (OF BETHSAIDA C. OBRA-WHITE FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SUN AGGREGATE LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

10/19/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/19/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/19/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Mail

10/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/28/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

9/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) ROE 2 SUN AGGREGATES LLC

9/22/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) ROE 2 SUN AGGREGATES LLC

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

9/22/2022: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) ROE #1 HI-WAY SAFETY RENTALS, INC.

6/10/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) ROE #1 HI-WAY SAFETY RENTALS, INC.

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Bethsaida C. Obra-White for Extension of Time for Cross-Defendants to Respond to Sun Aggregate LLC's Cross-Complaint Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 430.41); Filed by: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Default; Filed by: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Hi-Way Safety Rentals, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant); As to: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant); As to: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant); As to: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Sun Aggregates, LLC (Cross-Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Further Case Management Conference; Filed by: Luis Eduardo Rios Morales dba Rios Trucking, erroneously sued as Luis Morales Do1 and Rios Trucking Doe 2) Erroneously Sued As Luis Morales (Defendant); Right Truck. Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
248 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edgardo Pano, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Defendant); Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Edgardo Pano, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Defendant); Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edgardo Pano, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Serrano Development Group, Inc. (Defendant); Pacific Empire Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Azusa Block 36, LLC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******5419 Hearing Date: September 23, 2021 Dept: R

Plaintiff Edgardo Pano, Jr.’s MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS

Responding Party: None (unopposed, as of 9/13/21, 1:32 p.m.; due 9/10/21)

Tentative Ruling

Plaintiff Edgardo Pano, Jr.’s Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR.

The motion is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. Again, on August 17, 2021, Plaintiff filed a “Notice of Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections” (electronically served August 16, 2021), expressly advising therein that “[t]his pleading is only a notice. In accordance with CCP ; 1005(b), all of Plaintiff’s moving and supporting papers will be served and filed at least 16 court days before the hearing.” (Emphasis added.) No additional papers have been filed, to date (i.e., as of September 13, 2021, 1:32 p.m.)

'


Case Number: *******5419    Hearing Date: April 16, 2021    Dept: 29

Pano  vs.  Serrano Development

Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment Of Complicated Personal Injury (“PI”) Case To An Independent Calendar ("IC") Courtroom From Department 29, A PI Hub Court;

The Court's order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court, is posted on the court's website.

AFTER REVIEW OF THE FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER: Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented. At the direction of Department 1, this case is hereby ordered reassigned and transferred to the EAST District, the Honorable GLORIA WHITE-BROWN, Judge presiding in Department "J" of the POMONA Superior Court, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar Court.

(NOTE: ALL HEARINGS currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court Re: New hearing dates.)

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all Parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIOS TRUCKING is a litigant

Latest cases where TED SAKAIDA & SONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MANUEL D. TEJEDA TRUCKING INC is a litigant