This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 00:55:06 (UTC).

EDGARDO CHAVARRIA VS SANDRA ADAMS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 EDGARDO CHAVARRIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANDRA ADAMS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1670

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVARRIA EDGARDO

Defendants

ADAMS SANDRA

ADAMS SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN WHITNEY D

Defendant Attorneys

LESNIAK MARGARET M.

DOWNES PATRICK NORTON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/5/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Association of Attorney

4/6/2023: Association of Attorney

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

3/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

1/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/3/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer Answer OF SANDRA ADAMS AND SCOTT ADAMS TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

11/4/2022: Answer Answer OF SANDRA ADAMS AND SCOTT ADAMS TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

11/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

9/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/28/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/28/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/10/2024

Hearing09/10/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2024

Hearing08/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2024

Hearing06/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Patrick Norton Downes (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketAddress for Patrick Norton Downes (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Sandra Adams (Defendant); Scott Adams (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketJury Trial (7-10 Day Estimate) scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/30/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDGARDO CHAVARRIA (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Adams (Defendant); Scott Adams (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDGARDO CHAVARRIA (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Adams (Defendant); Scott Adams (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDGARDO CHAVARRIA (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Adams (Defendant); Scott Adams (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: EDGARDO CHAVARRIA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less