This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 10:30:01 (UTC).

EDGARDO CARRILLO VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 EDGARDO CARRILLO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3520

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO EDGARDO

Defendant

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRACE PHYL

Defendant Attorney

KAU NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/27/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

2/28/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

3/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/13/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

5/12/2020: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

6/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by State of California, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgardo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRACE PHYL