This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 13:47:19 (UTC).

EDGAR TERTERYAN VS JASMEN VARDANYAN

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 EDGAR TERTERYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JASMEN VARDANYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7647

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERTERYAN EDGAR

Defendant

VARDANYAN JASMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELIKYAN GEVORG

Defendant Attorney

FAIRCHILD DARA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/31/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/31/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/31/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/15/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2023
  • Hearing11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant); As to: Edgar Terteryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Edgar Terteryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant); Service Date: 08/09/2022; Service Cost: 70.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edgar Terteryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edgar Terteryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Edgar Terteryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jasmen Vardanyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAIRCHILD DARA