Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2019 at 01:12:10 (UTC).

EDGAR RAMON GUERRERO VS MICHAEL CHARLES CAIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 EDGAR RAMON GUERRERO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAEL CHARLES CAIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5845

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO EDGAR RAMON

Defendants

CAIN RICHARD

CAIN MICHAEL CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZADOURIAN ARMEN

Attorney at Law Offices of Armen Zadourian

2606 Foothill Bld Ste B

La Crescenta, CA 91214

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT KELLY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/14/2019: Answer

Other -

2/25/2019: Other -

Summons

2/20/2019: Summons

Complaint

2/20/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for

2/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edgar Ramon Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Charles Cain (Defendant); Richard Cain (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY); Filed by Michael Charles Cain (Defendant); Richard Cain (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Edgar Ramon Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edgar Ramon Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edgar Ramon Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgar Ramon Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less