Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 11:07:05 (UTC).

EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS, ET AL. VS LOS OLIVOS II APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS OLIVOS II APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1264

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILERA LILIA N.

NIEBLAS PALACIOS EDGAR

Defendants

LOS OLIVOS II APARTMENTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LOS OLIVOS APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/3/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

PI General Order

2/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDGAR NIEBLAS PALACIOS (Plaintiff); LILIA N. AGUILERA (Plaintiff); ANGELINA MEJIA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN