This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 11:54:48 (UTC).

EDGAR JESKE VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 EDGAR JESKE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7955

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESKE EDGAR

Defendants

LEON AMALIA MARTININ

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERARD JOHN F.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLUB BETH ISAACS

GALLAGHER MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/19/2021: Answer

Answer

11/19/2021: Answer

Answer

11/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Answer

12/14/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/10/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2024
  • Hearing10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2024
  • Hearing10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Amalia Martinon Jeske Erroneously Sued As Amalia Martinin Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Amalia Martinon Jeske Erroneously Sued As Amalia Martinin Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amalia Martinon Jeske Erroneously Sued As Amalia Martinin Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amalia Martinon Jeske Erroneously Sued As Amalia Martinin Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edgar Jeske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB, BETH ISAACS