This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 09:21:54 (UTC).

EDGAR GARCIA, VS DEEGAN EXPRESS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 EDGAR GARCIA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DEEGAN EXPRESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2604

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA EDGAR

Defendant

DEEGAN EXPRESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAN DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON TIMOTHY L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

5/19/2023: Case Management Order

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

5/19/2023: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/15/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

5/12/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/22/2023: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DEEGAN EXPRESS

3/16/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DEEGAN EXPRESS

Initial Status Conference Order

3/16/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/16/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/16/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/6/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/6/2023: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2023
  • Hearing09/29/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re. Filing Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re. Status of Mediation scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Case Management Order: Result Date changed from 05/22/2023 to 05/19/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 05/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Edgar Garcia, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman in Department 14 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edgar Garcia, (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Edgar Garcia, (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edgar Garcia, (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less