This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 20:22:50 (UTC).

EDGAR FRANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 EDGAR FRANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0207

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCO AN INDIVIDUAL EDGAR

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO. A OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/24/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/25/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDGAR FRANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDGAR FRANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDGAR FRANCO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less