This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:46:02 (UTC).

EDGAR ESCOBEDO VS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 EDGAR ESCOBEDO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5412

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCOBEDO EDGAR

Defendants

CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING INC.

CSC TRADING

SAKAJIAN SCOTT DBA CSC TRADING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

JONES DAVID GARY

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/19/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

3/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/2/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/8/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/10/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

RESPONSE OF DEFENDANTS AND COUNSEL GARY KAST TO OSC RE NON APPEARANCE AT CMC. MAY 10, 2018

5/10/2018: RESPONSE OF DEFENDANTS AND COUNSEL GARY KAST TO OSC RE NON APPEARANCE AT CMC. MAY 10, 2018

Proof of Service

7/3/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJ1AN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); ETC.

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJ1AN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); ETC.

Minute Order

7/11/2018: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/27/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF DAVID G. JONES RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJIAN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET O

8/3/2018: DECLARATION OF DAVID G. JONES RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJIAN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET O

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION/REPLY TO MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJIAN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ON

8/6/2018: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION/REPLY TO MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. AND SCOTT SAKAJIAN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ON

Proof of Service

8/9/2018: Proof of Service

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

8/9/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. FIRST SETS OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES?AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST. DEFENDANT AND ITS

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. FIRST SETS OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES?AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST. DEFENDANT AND ITS

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CSC AUTO SALVAGE AND DISMANTLING, INC. FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (ReMandatory Settlement Conference Setting) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Conference Re: Mandatory Settlement Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Edgar Escobedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (ReMandatory Settlement Conference Setting) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Conference Re: Mandatory Settlement Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Edgar Escobedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Edgar Escobedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgar Escobedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5412    Hearing Date: July 23, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: July 23, 2020

Case Name: Escobedo v. CSC Auto Salvage and Dismantling, Inc., et al.

Case No.: ****5412

Matter: Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs

Moving Party: Plaintiff Edgar Escobedo

Responding Party: Defendants CSC Auto Salvage and Dismantling, Inc. and Scott Sakajian


Tentative Ruling: The Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs is granted in part.


The parties have settled this matter and have agreed that Plaintiff may move for attorneys’ fees in an amount ranging from $40,000 to $100,000. Plaintiff’s lodestar figure is $149,786.20, but Plaintiff seeks $100,000.00 in fees and $6,985.98 in costs given the parameters of his settlement.

Defendants oppose the Motion on the grounds that (1) the hourly rates billed are excessive; (2) Plaintiff seeks fees for claims for which there is no statute providing for attorneys’ fees; (3) attorneys improperly billed for clerical tasks; (4) there are vague billing entries; (5) there is duplicative billing; (6) too many attorneys were involved; (7) billing for reconstructing time is inappropriate; (7) counsel may have only billed at current rates; (8) there should be a .75 negative multiplier; and (9) no costs are warranted because a memorandum of costs was not filed.

The Court notes the following inadequacies with Plaintiff’s attorneys’ fees request: (1) the request is partially premised on claims for which there is no statute allowing for fees; (2) the hourly rates of certain paralegals were excessive; and (3) an excessive number of attorneys billed for matters which do not appear necessary and reasonable for the litigation. However, the deductions considered by the Court would not place Plaintiff’s lodestar figure below $100,000. Therefore, pursuant to the parties’ settlement, the Court awards Plaintiff $100,000 in attorneys’ fees.

Defenants’ objections to Plaintiff’s costs are overruled because Plaintiff filed a memorandum of costs on May 4, 2020, but Defendants failed to file a motion to tax costs. On the other hand, the Court will award no more than $6,825.30 in costs because this is the amount requested in Plaintiff’s memorandum of costs. In sum, the Motion for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs is granted in part.