This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 01:14:15 (UTC).

EDGAR ESCALANTE VS KOOS MANUFACTURING, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 EDGAR ESCALANTE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KOOS MANUFACTURING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0306

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCALANTE EDGAR

Defendant

KOOS MANUFACTURING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS HENRY

Defendant Attorney

AMAN KALLEY R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF

11/23/2020: Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF

Notice of Ruling

12/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

12/10/2020: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/11/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/29/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement (of Plaintiff); Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Koos Manufacturing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Koos Manufacturing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edgar Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMAN KALLEY RAE