This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 08:22:27 (UTC).

EDGAR ALEMAN, M.D. VS GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 EDGAR ALEMAN, M D filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8826

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEMAN EDGAR M.D.

Defendants

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER DBA ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MEDICAL STAFF OF GLENDALE ADENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JURKOWITZ NICHOLAS DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

DAVENPORT CASSIDY COLE

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/24/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF STAY)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF STAY)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/28/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF STAY)

10/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF STAY)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/4/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF ACTION

7/11/2022: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF ACTION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/18/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS /BY DEFENDANT; CASE...)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS /BY DEFENDANT; CASE...)

Notice of Ruling

7/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

6/21/2022: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Request for Judicial Notice

6/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Case Management Statement

7/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY OF ACTION

7/5/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY OF ACTION

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/6/2022: Answer

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: STATUS OF STAY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference re: STATUS OF STAY scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: STATUS OF STAY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Status Conference re: STATUS OF STAY scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference re: STATUS OF STAY scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/28/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); MEDICAL STAFF OF GLENDALE ADENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDGAR ALEMAN, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); MEDICAL STAFF OF GLENDALE ADENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDGAR ALEMAN, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDGAR ALEMAN, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less