This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 16:02:08 (UTC).

EDDY HSIEH, ET AL. VS QUANG KHANH THAI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 EDDY HSIEH, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUANG KHANH THAI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3599

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPOS RAFAEL

GARCIA CRISPIN ALONSO

HSIEH EDDY

Defendants

THAI QUANG KHANH

TT HEALTHCARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSHIRE GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

KAIMAN BARRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/20/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/29/2021: Answer - ANSWER UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by QUANG KHANH THAI (Defendant); TT HEALTHCARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer (UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL); Filed by QUANG KHANH THAI (Defendant); TT HEALTHCARE, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff); RAFAEL CAMPOS (Plaintiff); CRISPIN ALONSO GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff); RAFAEL CAMPOS (Plaintiff); CRISPIN ALONSO GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff); RAFAEL CAMPOS (Plaintiff); CRISPIN ALONSO GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by EDDY HSIEH (Plaintiff); RAFAEL CAMPOS (Plaintiff); CRISPIN ALONSO GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAIMAN BARRY