Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 04:52:24 (UTC).

EDDIE MONIER VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 EDDIE MONIER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5785

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONNIER EDWARD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION CALTRANS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORSYTH THOMAS FLICKER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PELCH MANAL H.

SASSOUNIAN DIKRAN HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/11/2020

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/11/2020

Association of Attorney

7/21/2020: Association of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/3/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/3/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/4/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/31/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/22/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The People of The State of California Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Caltrans) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edward Monnier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SASSOUNIAN DIKRAN HOWARD