This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 01:00:41 (UTC).

EDDIE MENDOZA VS THAIS MILAGROS SCHONFELD CANINO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 EDDIE MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THAIS MILAGROS SCHONFELD CANINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6500

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA EDDIE

Defendants

SCHONFELD CANINO THAIS MILAGROS

ROJAS LUCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOLL ROBERT JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

5/27/2021: PI General Order

Answer

8/3/2021: Answer

Answer

6/24/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

8/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lucia Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Thais Milagros Schonfeld Canino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Thais Milagros Schonfeld Canino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thais Milagros Schonfeld Canino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eddie Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN