This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 14:42:22 (UTC).

EDDIE MEDRANO VS JOSE ELIAS FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 EDDIE MEDRANO filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE ELIAS FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1690

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDRANO EDDIE

Defendants

LINARES MARINA

FLORES JOSE ELIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH

VARGAS BRENDA E

SAYER MICHAEL

SAYER MICHAEL EASTON

Defendant Attorneys

CHANG DENNIS W

CHANG DENNIS WENDELL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

7/15/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/28/2021

6/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Related Case

Substitution of Attorney

6/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

6/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

6/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/20/2021

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/20/2021

Answer

5/21/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 2:06 PM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jose Elias Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Marina Linares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jose Elias Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eddie Medrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Marina Linares)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Jose Elias Flores)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAYER, MICHAEL E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAYER MICHAEL