Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 10:31:20 (UTC).

EDDIE L. BROWN, ET AL. VS MEB LOAN TRUST IV, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 EDDIE L BROWN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MEB LOAN TRUST IV, U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6408

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON JACQUELINE R.

BROWN EDDIE L.

Defendants

ZBS LAW LLP

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

MEB LOAN TRUST IV U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDS THOMAS D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS

6/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Nonmonetary Status); Filed by ZBS Law, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eddie L. Brown (Plaintiff); Jacqueline R. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ZBS LAW LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant