This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 07:54:07 (UTC).

EDDIE GOZINI, ET AL. VS ANTHONY CLIFFORD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 EDDIE GOZINI, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANTHONY CLIFFORD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0857

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOZINI EDDIE

GOZINI FARAH

Defendants

CLIFFORD ANTHONY

HARKHAM URI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEROKIM KOUSHA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/20/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Eddie Gozini, et al. on 06/09/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Eddie Gozini and Farah Gozini as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff); Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff); Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); Anthony Clifford (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff),Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 11/30/2022 ; As To Parties changed from Farah Gozini (Plaintiff), Anthony Clifford (Defendant), Uri Harkham (Defendant), Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff) to Uri Harkham (Defendant), Anthony Clifford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to Serve scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to Serve scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff); Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Clifford (Defendant); Uri Harkham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff); Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Clifford (Defendant); Uri Harkham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eddie Gozini (Plaintiff); Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Clifford (Defendant); Uri Harkham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEROKIM KOUSHA