This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 00:55:14 (UTC).

EDDIE GONZALEZ VS ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 EDDIE GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1440

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ EDDIE

Defendants

LOZANO MANUAL

MACARIAN JOHN

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRIME HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES- ST. FRANCIS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOOSEFIAN RONALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/23/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/23/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/23/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

4/5/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eddie Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. FRANCIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant