This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 21:41:15 (UTC).

ECURE CA, LLC VS UHC OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 ECURE CA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UHC OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1225

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ECURE CA LLC

Defendants

UHC OF CALIFORNIA AKA UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA

UNITEDHEALTHCARE BENEFITS PLAN OF CALIFORNIA

UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN ERIC D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ECURE CA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ECURE CA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ECURE CA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECURE CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UHC of California is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chan, Eric D.