This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 04:01:10 (UTC).

ECOLOGICAL ALLIANCE, LLC VS GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 ECOLOGICAL ALLIANCE, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5572

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ECOLOGICAL ALLIANCE LLC

Defendant

GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABIRI ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS MATTHEW PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEF...)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEF...) OF 12/07/2021

12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEF...) OF 12/07/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

12/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

12/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order to Extend Defendant?s Deadline to Respond to Complaint); Filed by Gerber Products Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 11:37 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Def...) of 12/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Defendant?s Deadline to Respond to Complaint); Filed by Gerber Products Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ecological Alliance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ecological Alliance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ecological Alliance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gerber Products Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ECOLOGICAL ALLIANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS MATTHEW PAUL