This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2022 at 15:54:56 (UTC).

ECKART SALQUIST, ET AL. VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 ECKART SALQUIST filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3105

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ADVANCE AUTO PARTS INC.

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AUTOZONE INC.

BASF CATALYSTS LLC

BASF CORPORATION

BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC.

CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION INC. AKA MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES INC.

CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC

D&J AUTO REPAIR CENTER INC.

DAP PRODUCTS INC.

DCO LLC

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GENERAL PARTS INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY DBA NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION NAPA

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC FKA HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC.

HENRY COMPANY LLC

HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ASPERICUETA ERIKA

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

CHAVES MARISA

EBERLEIN JOHN ANDREW

IRWIN GEORGE HUMPHRIES

LUONG KAREN

NICHOLS STEPHEN M

PEATMAN STEPHANIE GHANEM

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J

POND FRANK

WILLIAMSON IAN GARTH

Other Attorneys

FORBES-KING SHAWNA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

2/16/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

2/16/2022: Answer - ANSWER METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/17/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

2/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/1/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

3/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/1/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/1/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER OF OF DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

3/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF OF DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer

3/2/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES- ASBESTOS

3/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES- ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

3/3/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/3/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

3/4/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant Shell Oil Company?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Personal Injury); Filed by SHELL OIL COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by 3M COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DCO LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by GENERAL PARTS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint); Filed by GENERAL PARTS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Of Of Defendant The Pep Boys ? Manny, Moe & Jack Of California To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos); Filed by THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MORSE TEC LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Personal Injury And Loss Of Consortium - Asbestos); Filed by HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Metropolitan Life Insurance Company?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Personal Injury ? Asbestos); Filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eckart Salquist (Plaintiff); Jenny Salquist (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eckart Salquist (Plaintiff); Jenny Salquist (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by Eckart Salquist (Plaintiff); Jenny Salquist (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eckart Salquist (Plaintiff); Jenny Salquist (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL PARTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE AUTO PARTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as successor to the former Vellumoid division of Federal-Mogul is a litigant