This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 11:31:59 (UTC).

EC SUPPLY, INC. VS RIC INSURANCE GENERAL AGENCY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 EC SUPPLY, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RIC INSURANCE GENERAL AGENCY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7020

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EC SUPPLY INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HA LESLIE LAN

LESLIE HA INSURANCE AGENCY A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

RIC INSURANCE GENERAL AGENCY INC.

KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY

LESLIE HA INSURANCE AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RIFFLE EDWARD JOSEPH

SCHWOB LANDON

ZAKS MICHELLE AMANDA

Other Attorneys

HESS RANDY MALCOLM

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/29/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

3/17/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

3/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/29/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/16/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/16/2021: Cross-Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RIC Insurance General Agency, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Leslie Ha Insurance Agency (Defendant); Leslie Lan Ha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Leslie Ha Insurance Agency (Defendant); Leslie Lan Ha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Leslie Lan Ha (Cross-Defendant); Leslie Ha Insurance Agency (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Leslie Ha Insurance Agency (Defendant); Leslie Lan Ha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EC Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hess, Randy M.