This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2022 at 05:13:43 (UTC).

EBRAHIM BIDGOLI VS REGENCY PLASTERING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 EBRAHIM BIDGOLI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against REGENCY PLASTERING, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9369

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

BIDGOLI EBRAHIM

CORONELL CONSTRUCTION INC.

GRETNA PARK LP

Cross Defendants and Defendants

CORONELL CONSTRUCTION INC.

GRETNA PARK LP

REGENCY PLASTERING INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

REGENCY PLASTERING INC.

Not Classified By Court

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOX JAMES E. ESQ.

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorney

SILVER GERALD NEIL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ROUNTREE SCOTT THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/9/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/9/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Notice of Lien

10/21/2022: Notice of Lien

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

12/16/2022: Cross-Complaint

General Denial

12/16/2022: General Denial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2024
  • Hearing09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2024
  • Hearing02/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant); As to: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE (Defendant on defendant's claim); CORONELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); As to: CORONELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/31/2022; Service Cost: 149.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); As to: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2022; Service Cost: 117.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Scott Thomas Rountree (Attorney): Organization Name changed from ICW Group to Attorney Service of San Dimas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Non-Party); Insurance Company of the West (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); As to: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant); CORONELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); GRETNA PARK, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); As to: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant); CORONELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); GRETNA PARK, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EBRAHIM BIDGOLI (Plaintiff); As to: REGENCY PLASTERING, INC. (Defendant); CORONELL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); GRETNA PARK, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORONELL CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where REGENCY PLASTERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUNTREE SCOTT THOMAS